NJ A586 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A5246
Note: Carry Over of previous S3585
Note: Carry Over of previous S3585
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing Committee
Pending: Assembly Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing Committee
Pending: Assembly Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires expanded use of affordable housing voucher program funding for homeownership expense assistance.
Title
Requires expanded use of affordable housing voucher program funding for homeownership expense assistance.
Sponsors
Rep. Sterley Stanley [D] | Rep. Reginald Atkins [D] | Rep. Verlina Reynolds-Jackson [D] | Rep. Benjie Wimberly [D] |
Rep. Michael Venezia [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-09 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A5246 (Carry Over) 2023-03-20 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
S3585 (Carry Over) 2023-03-02 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S1430 (Same As) 2024-01-25 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S3585 (Carry Over) 2023-03-02 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S1430 (Same As) 2024-01-25 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2024/A586 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2024/A1000/586_I1.HTM |
Supplement | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2024/A1000/586_E1.PDF |