NJ ACR140 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-4)
Status: Passed on June 20 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-20 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-4)
Status: Passed on June 20 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-20 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Honors Korean veterans of Vietnam War.
Title
Honors Korean veterans of Vietnam War.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for SCR110 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-13 - Senate - Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-26 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-23 - Assembly - Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for SCR110 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-13 - Senate - Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-26 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-23 - Assembly - Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-20 | Senate | Filed with Secretary of State |
2023-06-20 | Senate | Resolution Passed Senate (37-0) |
2023-06-20 | Senate | Substituted for SCR110 (1R) |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee |
2023-01-26 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (77-0-0) |
2023-01-23 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2022-05-09 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
SCR110 (Same As) 2023-06-20 - Substituted by ACR140