NJ ACR159 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SCR173
Note: Carry Over of previous ACR237
Note: Carry Over of previous ACR237
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Introduced on March 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-21 - Substituted by SCR91
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-21 - Substituted by SCR91
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Proposes constitutional amendment to allow certain organizations to use proceeds from games of chance to benefit organization.
Title
Proposes constitutional amendment to allow certain organizations to use proceeds from games of chance to benefit organization.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-05 - Assembly - Assembly Tourism, Gaming and the Arts Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-21 | Assembly | Substituted by SCR91 |
2021-05-06 | Assembly | Concurrent Resolution Placed on Desk in Senate |
2021-05-05 | Assembly | Concurrent Resolution Placed on Desk in Assembly |
2021-05-05 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-03-16 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Tourism, Gaming and the Arts Committee |
Same As/Similar To
SCR91 (Same As) 2021-06-21 - Filed with Secretary of State
SCR173 (Carry Over) 2019-06-13 - Concurrent Resolution Placed on Desk in Assembly
ACR237 (Carry Over) 2019-06-10 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Tourism, Gaming and the Arts Committee
SCR173 (Carry Over) 2019-06-13 - Concurrent Resolution Placed on Desk in Assembly
ACR237 (Carry Over) 2019-06-10 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Tourism, Gaming and the Arts Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/ACR159 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/ACR/159_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=ACR159 |