NJ ACR219 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on March 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-25 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on March 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-25 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates week of April 7 through April 13, 2019 as "Local Government Week."
Title
Designates week of April 7 through April 13, 2019 as "Local Government Week."
Sponsors
Rep. Craig Coughlin [D] | Sen. Jon Bramnick [R] | Rep. Vincent Mazzeo [D] | Sen. Troy Singleton [D] |
Sen. Angela Mcknight [D] | Sen. John McKeon [D] | Rep. Carol Murphy [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for SCR162 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - Assembly - Assembly State and Local Government Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - Assembly - Assembly State and Local Government Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-25 | Senate | Filed with Secretary of State |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Resolution Passed Senate (37-0) |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Substituted for SCR162 |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2019-03-25 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (79-0-0) |
2019-03-11 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2019-02-25 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee |
Same As/Similar To
SCR162 (Same As) 2019-03-25 - Substituted by ACR219
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2018/ACR219 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2018/ACR/219_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=ACR219 |