NJ AJR47 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future AJR18
Note: Carry Foward to future SJR24
Note: Carry Over of previous AJR114
Note: Carry Foward to future SJR24
Note: Carry Over of previous AJR114
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-08 - Substituted by SJR23
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-08 - Substituted by SJR23
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes task force to study and make recommendations concerning stabilization and growth of volunteer first responder community.
Title
Establishes task force to study and make recommendations concerning stabilization and growth of volunteer first responder community.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-12-04 - Assembly - Assembly Homeland Security and State Preparedness Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-08 | Assembly | Substituted by SJR23 |
2017-12-04 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-01-27 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Homeland Security and State Preparedness Committee |
Same As/Similar To
AJR47 (Carry Over) 2018-01-08 - Substituted by SJR23
AJR47 (Carry Over) 2018-01-08 - Substituted by SJR23
AJR114 (Carry Over) 2015-06-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Homeland Security and State Preparedness Committee
SJR23 (Same As) 2018-01-08 - Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (70-0-0)
AJR47 (Carry Over) 2018-01-08 - Substituted by SJR23
AJR114 (Carry Over) 2015-06-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Homeland Security and State Preparedness Committee
SJR23 (Same As) 2018-01-08 - Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (70-0-0)
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2016/AJR47 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2016/AJR/47_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=AJR47 |