NJ AJR67 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous AJR120
Note: Carry Over of previous SJR58
Note: Carry Over of previous SJR58
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Public Safety and Preparedness Committee
Pending: Assembly Public Safety and Preparedness Committee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Public Safety and Preparedness Committee
Pending: Assembly Public Safety and Preparedness Committee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates last week of April of each year as "Reentry week."
Title
Designates last week of April of each year as "Reentry week."
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-09 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Public Safety and Preparedness Committee |
Same As/Similar To
AJR120 (Carry Over) 2022-02-28 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
SJR58 (Carry Over) 2023-02-23 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
SJR97 (Same As) 2024-03-04 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
SJR58 (Carry Over) 2023-02-23 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
SJR97 (Same As) 2024-03-04 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2024/AJR67 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2024/AJR/67_I1.HTM |