NJ AR213 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on January 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-01-11 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on January 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-01-11 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Supports establishment of federal Department of Veterans Affairs community-based clinic in Sussex County.
Title
Supports establishment of federal Department of Veterans Affairs community-based clinic in Sussex County.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-01-11 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-16 - Assembly - Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-16 - Assembly - Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-11 | Assembly | Filed with Secretary of State |
2016-01-11 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (75-0-0) |
2015-11-16 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2015-02-05 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
SR114 (Same As) 2015-07-23 - Filed with Secretary of State
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2014/AR213 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2014/AR/213_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=AR213 |