NJ S1027 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-5)
Status: Passed on January 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-06 - Approved P.L.2014, c.86.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-5)
Status: Passed on January 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-06 - Approved P.L.2014, c.86.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Designates State Highway Route No. 35 bridge between Brielle and Point Pleasant Beach as "Veterans of All Wars Memorial Bridge."
Title
Designates State Highway Route No. 35 bridge between Brielle and Point Pleasant Beach as "Veterans of All Wars Memorial Bridge."
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-11-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute For A3758 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-11-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-11-13 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-11-13 - Assembly - Assembly Substitute For A3758 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-10-09 - Assembly - Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-17 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-11-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-11-13 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-11-13 - Assembly - Assembly Substitute For A3758 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-10-09 - Assembly - Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-17 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-06 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2014, c.86. |
2014-11-13 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (75-0-0) |
2014-11-13 | Assembly | Substituted for A3758 |
2014-10-09 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2014-05-08 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (37-0) |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3758 (Same As) 2014-11-13 - Substituted by S1027 (1R)