NJ S1028 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S3817
Note: Carry Over of previous A5571
Note: Carry Over of previous A5571
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on January 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-07 - Approved P.L.2020, c.153.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on January 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-07 - Approved P.L.2020, c.153.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Allocates Amistad Commission in but not of DOE; requires commission to elect chairperson and appoint executive director; requires public schools to include instruction on accomplishments and contributions of African Americans to American society.
Title
Allocates Amistad Commission in but not of DOE; requires commission to elect chairperson and appoint executive director; requires public schools to include instruction on accomplishments and contributions of African Americans to American society.
Sponsors
Sen. Teresa Ruiz [D] | Sen. Shirley Turner [D] | Sen. Troy Singleton [D] | Rep. Annette Quijano [D] |
Sen. Linda Greenstein [D] | Rep. Mila Jasey [D] | Rep. Pamela Lampitt [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-11-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A3601 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-11-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-22 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-11-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-22 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-07 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2020, c.153. |
2020-11-16 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (74-0-0) |
2020-11-16 | Assembly | Substituted for A3601 (1R) |
2020-10-22 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-03-05 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Education Committee |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (40-0) |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3817 (Carry Over) 2019-12-09 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
A3601 (Same As) 2020-11-16 - Substituted by S1028 (1R)
A5571 (Carry Over) 2019-12-09 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
A3601 (Same As) 2020-11-16 - Substituted by S1028 (1R)
A5571 (Carry Over) 2019-12-09 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading