NJ S1047 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A5709
Note: Carry Over of previous S3969
Note: Carry Over of previous S3969
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on November 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-08 - Approved P.L.2021, c.268.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on November 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-08 - Approved P.L.2021, c.268.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Concerns disclosure of certain information prior to sale of real estate.
Title
Concerns disclosure of certain information prior to sale of real estate.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A1712 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Regulated Professions Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A1712 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Regulated Professions Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-11-08 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2021, c.268. |
2021-06-24 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (75-0-0) |
2021-06-24 | Assembly | Substituted for A1712 |
2021-06-14 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2021-03-25 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Regulated Professions Committee |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (35-0) |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A1712 (Same As) 2021-06-24 - Substituted by S1047
A5709 (Carry Over) 2019-08-23 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Regulated Professions Committee
S3969 (Carry Over) 2019-06-20 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
A5709 (Carry Over) 2019-08-23 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Regulated Professions Committee
S3969 (Carry Over) 2019-06-20 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee