NJ S1057 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous A4274

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-2)
Status: Passed on February 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-07 - Approved P.L.2019, c.34.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Requires EDA, in consultation with Department of Agriculture, to establish loan program for certain vineyard and winery capital expenses.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires EDA, in consultation with Department of Agriculture, to establish loan program for certain vineyard and winery capital expenses.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-31 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 75 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Adopt Governor Recommendations (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A1046 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 70 N: 3 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - Assembly - Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - Senate - Senate Economic Growth Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-07AssemblyApproved P.L.2019, c.34.
2019-01-31AssemblyPassed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (75-2-0)
2018-10-29AssemblyReceived in the Assembly on Concurrence with Gov. Recommend.
2018-10-29SenatePassed by the Senate (40-0)
2018-09-27Senate2nd Reading in the Senate on Concur. w/Governor's Recommend. (39-0)
2018-07-23SenateConditional Veto, Received in the Senate
2018-06-07AssemblyPassed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (70-3-0)
2018-06-07AssemblySubstituted for A1046 (1R)
2018-06-04AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-06-04AssemblyRecommitted to Assembly Appropriations Committee
2018-05-07AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-05-07AssemblyTransferred to Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
2018-03-05AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee
2018-02-26SenatePassed by the Senate (38-0)
2018-02-05SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-01-25SenateReferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
2018-01-25SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2018-01-22SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee

Same As/Similar To

A3439 (Same As) 2018-03-05 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
A4274 (Carry Over) 2017-01-12 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
A1046 (Same As) 2018-06-07 - Substituted by S1057 (1R)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback