NJ S1198 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-30 - Substituted by A2669 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-30 - Substituted by A2669 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Regulates certain motor vehicle ancillary production products as service contracts.
Title
Regulates certain motor vehicle ancillary production products as service contracts.
Sponsors
Sen. Nellie Pou [D] | Sen. Steven Oroho [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-07-23 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-30 | Senate | Substituted by A2669 (1R) |
2020-07-22 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2669 (Same As) 2020-09-14 - Approved P.L.2020, c.86.