NJ S1339 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous S2919

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-5)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-25 - Substituted by A2031 (ACS/2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Enhances enforcement and oversight of mental health condition and substance use disorder parity laws.**

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Enhances enforcement and oversight of mental health condition and substance use disorder parity laws.**

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-18 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-25SenateSubstituted by A2031 (ACS/2R)
2019-03-18SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2019-01-17SenateReferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
2019-01-17SenateReported from Senate Committee as a Substitute, 2nd Reading
2018-02-01SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee

Same As/Similar To

A2031 (Same As) 2019-04-11 - Approved P.L.2019, c.58.
S2919 (Carry Over) 2017-01-23 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback