NJ S1395 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S345
Note: Carry Over of previous A1987
Note: Carry Over of previous A1987
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on February 12 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-12 - Withdrawn from Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on February 12 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-12 - Withdrawn from Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Concerns development of accessory dwelling units.
Title
Concerns development of accessory dwelling units.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-12 | Senate | Withdrawn from Consideration |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S345 (Carry Over) 2023-02-27 - Senate Amendment (Voice) (Ruiz)
A1987 (Carry Over) 2022-01-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing Committee
A2489 (Same As) 2024-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing Committee
A1987 (Carry Over) 2022-01-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing Committee
A2489 (Same As) 2024-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2024/S1395 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2024/S1500/1395_I1.HTM |