NJ S1415 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S2628
Note: Carry Over of previous A4102
Note: Carry Over of previous A4102
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-18 - Substituted by A2267 (ACS/1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-18 - Substituted by A2267 (ACS/1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Requires HMFA to establish affordable housing insurance pilot program; appropriates $5 million.
Title
Requires HMFA to establish affordable housing insurance pilot program; appropriates $5 million.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-11 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-25 - Senate - Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-25 - Senate - Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-18 | Senate | Substituted by A2267 (ACS/1R) |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee as a Substitute, 2nd Reading |
2024-01-25 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2024-01-25 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2628 (Carry Over) 2023-03-20 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
A4102 (Carry Over) 2023-03-20 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
A2267 (Same As) 2024-03-20 - Approved P.L.2024, c.4.
A4102 (Carry Over) 2023-03-20 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
A2267 (Same As) 2024-03-20 - Approved P.L.2024, c.4.