NJ S1443 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S4117
Note: Carry Over of previous A5736
Note: Carry Over of previous A5736
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-15 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-15 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes mortgage payment relief and foreclosure protection for certain homeowners impacted by the remnants of Hurricane Ida.
Title
Establishes mortgage payment relief and foreclosure protection for certain homeowners impacted by the remnants of Hurricane Ida.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-15 - Senate - Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S4117 (Carry Over) 2024-01-04 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
A5736 (Carry Over) 2023-11-20 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing Committee
A2294 (Same As) 2024-04-15 - Passed by the Assembly (72-1-0)
A5736 (Carry Over) 2023-11-20 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing Committee
A2294 (Same As) 2024-04-15 - Passed by the Assembly (72-1-0)