NJ S1606 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A2574
Note: Carry Foward to future S1651
Note: Carry Over of previous S2687
Note: Carry Foward to future S1651
Note: Carry Over of previous S2687
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-18 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee
Pending: Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-18 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee
Pending: Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Permits small businesses to qualify for loans from EDA for costs of energy audit and making energy efficiency or conservation improvements.
Title
Permits small businesses to qualify for loans from EDA for costs of energy audit and making energy efficiency or conservation improvements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-18 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (32-1) |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1606 (Carry Over) 2019-03-18 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee
S1606 (Carry Over) 2019-03-18 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee
S2687 (Carry Over) 2016-10-13 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
A3940 (Same As) 2018-05-10 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee
S1606 (Carry Over) 2019-03-18 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee
S2687 (Carry Over) 2016-10-13 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
A3940 (Same As) 2018-05-10 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee