NJ S1610 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S1715
Note: Carry Over of previous A1715
Note: Carry Over of previous A1715
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-13 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-13 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes measures to deter steroid use among students; appropriates $45,000 to DOE for New Jersey State Interscholastic Athletic Association testing of student-athletes for steroids and other performance enhancing substances.
Title
Establishes measures to deter steroid use among students; appropriates $45,000 to DOE for New Jersey State Interscholastic Athletic Association testing of student-athletes for steroids and other performance enhancing substances.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-13 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1715 (Carry Over) 2018-02-05 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
A3672 (Same As) 2020-03-16 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
A1715 (Carry Over) 2018-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
A3672 (Same As) 2020-03-16 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
A1715 (Carry Over) 2018-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/S1610 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/S2000/1610_I1.HTM |