NJ S1672 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S244
Note: Carry Foward to future A3235
Note: Carry Over of previous S3309
Note: Carry Foward to future A3235
Note: Carry Over of previous S3309
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 23 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-23 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 23 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-23 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
"Combat to College Act"; grants priority course registration to military service members and veterans attending public institutions of higher education.
Title
"Combat to College Act"; grants priority course registration to military service members and veterans attending public institutions of higher education.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Van Drew [D] | Sen. Christopher Connors [R] | Sen. Anthony R. Bucco [R] | Sen. James Beach [D] |
Sen. Nilsa Cruz-Perez [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-06-23 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-23 - Senate - Senate Higher Eduction Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-23 - Senate - Senate Higher Eduction Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-23 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee |
2016-06-23 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (38-0) |
2016-05-23 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1672 (Carry Over) 2016-06-23 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee
S1672 (Carry Over) 2016-06-23 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee
S3309 (Carry Over) 2015-12-17 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee
A2950 (Same As) 2016-02-16 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee
S1672 (Carry Over) 2016-06-23 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee
S3309 (Carry Over) 2015-12-17 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee
A2950 (Same As) 2016-02-16 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee