NJ S183 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S265
Note: Carry Over of previous S3846
Note: Carry Over of previous A5716
Note: Carry Over of previous S3846
Note: Carry Over of previous A5716
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires school districts to close schools on days of general and primary elections.
Title
Requires school districts to close schools on days of general and primary elections.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S183 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
S3846 (Carry Over) 2019-06-03 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
A5235 (Same As) 2021-01-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
A5716 (Carry Over) 2019-08-23 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
S3846 (Carry Over) 2019-06-03 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
A5235 (Same As) 2021-01-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
A5716 (Carry Over) 2019-08-23 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/S183 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/S0500/183_I1.HTM |