NJ S1838 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 24 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-03 - Substituted by A2765
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-03 - Substituted by A2765
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Changes designation on official State logo denoting manufacture of products in New Jersey.
Title
Changes designation on official State logo denoting manufacture of products in New Jersey.
Sponsors
Sen. Linda Greenstein [D] | Sen. Steven Oroho [R] | Sen. Nellie Pou [D] | Sen. Michael Testa [R] |
Sen. Shirley Turner [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-04 - Senate - Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-03 | Senate | Substituted by A2765 |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2765 (Same As) 2021-09-28 - Approved P.L.2021, c.240.