NJ S1965 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S3609
Note: Carry Over of previous A5248
Note: Carry Over of previous A5248
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-14 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-14 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Regulates provision of pharmaceutical services in long-term care facilities.
Title
Regulates provision of pharmaceutical services in long-term care facilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-14 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-14 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3609 (Carry Over) 2023-02-16 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
A5248 (Carry Over) 2023-12-11 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
A5248 (Carry Over) 2023-12-11 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee