NJ S1968 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-28 - Approved P.L.2018, c.44.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-28 - Approved P.L.2018, c.44.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Extends document submission deadline for certain residential and mixed use parking projects under Economic Redevelopment and Growth Grant program; increases maximum credit amounts awarded for certain residential and mixed use parking projects.
Title
Extends document submission deadline for certain residential and mixed use parking projects under Economic Redevelopment and Growth Grant program; increases maximum credit amounts awarded for certain residential and mixed use parking projects.
Sponsors
Sen. Nellie Pou [D] | Rep. Benjie Wimberly [D] | Sen. Raj Mukherji [D] | Rep. Shavonda Sumter [D] |
Rep. Eliana Marin [D] | Sen. Nilsa Cruz-Perez [D] | Sen. Teresa Ruiz [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 54 N: 23 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 34 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - Senate - Senate Floor: Adopt Governor Recommendations (Y: 31 N: 5 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A3619 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 30 N: 6 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 19 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-05 - Senate - Senate Economic Growth Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-05 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 34 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - Senate - Senate Floor: Adopt Governor Recommendations (Y: 31 N: 5 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A3619 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 30 N: 6 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 19 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-05 - Senate - Senate Economic Growth Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-05 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-28 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2018, c.44. |
2018-06-25 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (54-23-0) |
2018-06-21 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly on Concurrence with Gov. Recommend. |
2018-06-21 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (34-5) |
2018-06-07 | Senate | 2nd Reading in the Senate on Concur. w/Governor's Recommend. (31-5) |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Conditional Veto, Received in the Senate |
2018-04-12 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (49-19-0) |
2018-04-12 | Assembly | Substituted for A3619 |
2018-04-12 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (30-6) |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3619 (Same As) 2018-04-12 - Substituted by S1968