NJ S2010 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S1676
Note: Carry Foward to future A3707
Note: Carry Over of previous A5746
Note: Carry Over of previous S2413
Note: Carry Over of previous A4115
Note: Carry Foward to future A3707
Note: Carry Over of previous A5746
Note: Carry Over of previous S2413
Note: Carry Over of previous A4115
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-03 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Pending: Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-03 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Pending: Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires certain doctors and nurses to ask patients questions regarding menstrual cycles, previous tampon use, and toxic shock syndrome.
Title
Requires certain doctors and nurses to ask patients questions regarding menstrual cycles, previous tampon use, and toxic shock syndrome.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-03 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2010 (Carry Over) 2022-03-03 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
S2010 (Carry Over) 2022-03-03 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
A2540 (Same As) 2022-02-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health Committee
A5746 (Carry Over) 2021-05-17 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health Committee
S2413 (Carry Over) 2020-05-14 - Substituted by A3966 (ACS)
A4115 (Carry Over) 2020-05-07 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee
S2010 (Carry Over) 2022-03-03 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
A2540 (Same As) 2022-02-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health Committee
A5746 (Carry Over) 2021-05-17 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health Committee
S2413 (Carry Over) 2020-05-14 - Substituted by A3966 (ACS)
A4115 (Carry Over) 2020-05-07 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2022/S2010 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2022/S2500/2010_I1.HTM |