NJ S2019 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S3556
Note: Carry Over of previous A5102
Note: Carry Over of previous A5102
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-05 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
Pending: Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-05 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
Pending: Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends certain benefits to veterans who received a badge, medal, or ribbon for serving in federal military campaign or expedition.
Title
Extends certain benefits to veterans who received a badge, medal, or ribbon for serving in federal military campaign or expedition.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-05 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A278 (Same As) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
S3556 (Carry Over) 2019-03-07 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
A5102 (Carry Over) 2019-03-05 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
S3556 (Carry Over) 2019-03-07 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
A5102 (Carry Over) 2019-03-05 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/S2019 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/S2500/2019_I1.HTM |