NJ S2180 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S882
Note: Carry Over of previous A1464
Note: Carry Over of previous A1464
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-09-21 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-09-21 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows tax credits for development of qualified wind energy facilities in certain portfield sites.
Title
Allows tax credits for development of qualified wind energy facilities in certain portfield sites.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-09-17 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-21 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2020-09-17 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3564 (Same As) 2020-02-25 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee
S882 (Carry Over) 2018-01-16 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
A1464 (Carry Over) 2018-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee
S882 (Carry Over) 2018-01-16 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
A1464 (Carry Over) 2018-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee