NJ S2248 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 23 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-11 - Substituted by A3276 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 23 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-11 - Substituted by A3276 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
"Mainland Memoriam Act"; directs MVC to create graduated driver's license informational material to be distributed by motor vehicle dealers.
Title
"Mainland Memoriam Act"; directs MVC to create graduated driver's license informational material to be distributed by motor vehicle dealers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-11 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-11 | Senate | Substituted by A3276 (2R) |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2014-06-23 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3276 (Same As) 2016-01-19 - Approved P.L.2015, c.286.