NJ S2258 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A2595
Note: Carry Foward to future S1640
Note: Carry Over of previous A338
Note: Carry Foward to future S1640
Note: Carry Over of previous A338
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-14 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-14 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes political subdivisions to require recipients of economic development incentives to enter into community benefits agreements.
Title
Authorizes political subdivisions to require recipients of economic development incentives to enter into community benefits agreements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-14 - Senate - Senate Economic Growth Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-14 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2258 (Carry Over) 2018-05-14 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
S2258 (Carry Over) 2018-05-14 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
A2612 (Same As) 2018-02-01 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee
A338 (Carry Over) 2017-06-12 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
S2258 (Carry Over) 2018-05-14 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
A2612 (Same As) 2018-02-01 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee
A338 (Carry Over) 2017-06-12 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading