NJ S2312 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A5868
Note: Carry Over of previous S4271
Note: Carry Over of previous S4271
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-18 - Substituted by A3337 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-18 - Substituted by A3337 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows projects supported by State or municipal affordable housing trust fund to be exempt from property tax and to instead contribute to municipal services by making payments in lieu of taxation.
Title
Allows projects supported by State or municipal affordable housing trust fund to be exempt from property tax and to instead contribute to municipal services by making payments in lieu of taxation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-11 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-25 - Senate - Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-25 - Senate - Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-18 | Senate | Substituted by A3337 (1R) |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2024-01-25 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2024-01-25 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2024-01-25 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3337 (Same As) 2024-03-20 - Approved P.L.2024, c.6.
A5868 (Carry Over) 2024-01-08 - Passed by the Assembly (70-6-0)
S4271 (Carry Over) 2024-01-04 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
A5868 (Carry Over) 2024-01-08 - Passed by the Assembly (70-6-0)
S4271 (Carry Over) 2024-01-04 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee