NJ S2419 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S1268
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on January 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-21 - Approved P.L.2021, c.2.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on January 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-21 - Approved P.L.2021, c.2.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Concerns local government regulation of installation, maintenance and repair of perimeter fence intrusion protection systems, other alarm systems, and locksmithing services.
Title
Concerns local government regulation of installation, maintenance and repair of perimeter fence intrusion protection systems, other alarm systems, and locksmithing services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-01-11 - Senate - Senate Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-11 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 69 N: 6 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-11-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: Adopt Governor Recommendations (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-24 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-24 - Senate - Senate Floor: Concur in Assembly Amendments (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-24 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-24 - Senate - Senate Floor: Reconsidered Vote (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-27 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A3143 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-27 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 72 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-13 - Assembly - Assembly State and Local Government Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Enact Emergency Clause (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-24 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-11 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 69 N: 6 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-11-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: Adopt Governor Recommendations (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-24 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-24 - Senate - Senate Floor: Concur in Assembly Amendments (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-24 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-24 - Senate - Senate Floor: Reconsidered Vote (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-27 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A3143 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-27 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 72 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-13 - Assembly - Assembly State and Local Government Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Enact Emergency Clause (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-24 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-21 | Senate | Approved P.L.2021, c.2. |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (69-6-0) |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Received in the Assembly on Concurrence with Gov. Recommend. |
2021-01-11 | Assembly | Passed by the Senate (33-1) |
2020-11-16 | Assembly | 2nd Reading in the Senate on Concur. w/Governor's Recommend. (37-1) |
2020-11-09 | Assembly | Conditional Veto, Received in the Senate |
2020-09-24 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (34-1) |
2020-09-24 | Senate | Reconsidered Vote To Sa (Scutari) (34-0) |
2020-09-24 | Senate | Senate Amendment (29-0) (Scutari) |
2020-09-17 | Senate | Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2020-08-27 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (72-6-0) |
2020-08-27 | Assembly | Substituted for A3143 (1R) |
2020-08-13 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-08-13 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee |
2020-07-02 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Regulated Professions Committee |
2020-06-29 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (35-1) |
2020-06-29 | Senate | Emergency Resolution (34-0) (Scutari) |
2020-06-29 | Senate | Senate Amendment (34-0) (Scutari) |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2419 (Carry Over) 2021-01-21 - Approved P.L.2021, c.2.
A3143 (Same As) 2020-08-27 - Substituted by S2419 (2R)
A3143 (Same As) 2020-08-27 - Substituted by S2419 (2R)