NJ S2423 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S4258
Note: Carry Over of previous A5880
Note: Carry Over of previous A5880
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-18 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Public Safety and Preparedness Committee
Pending: Assembly Public Safety and Preparedness Committee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-18 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Public Safety and Preparedness Committee
Pending: Assembly Public Safety and Preparedness Committee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Renames Juvenile Justice Commission as Youth Justice Commission.
Title
Renames Juvenile Justice Commission as Youth Justice Commission.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-18 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - Senate - Senate Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - Senate - Senate Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-18 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Public Safety and Preparedness Committee |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (38-0) |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S4258 (Carry Over) 2023-12-28 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
A5880 (Carry Over) 2023-12-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
A3678 (Same As) 2024-02-12 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Public Safety and Preparedness Committee
A5880 (Carry Over) 2023-12-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
A3678 (Same As) 2024-02-12 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Public Safety and Preparedness Committee