NJ S2523 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on January 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-01-11 - Approved P.L.2015, c.182.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on January 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-01-11 - Approved P.L.2015, c.182.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Permits municipalities and municipal parking authorities to create Senior Citizen Priority Parking Program.
Title
Permits municipalities and municipal parking authorities to create Senior Citizen Priority Parking Program.
Sponsors
Sen. Nia Gill [D] | Sen. Linda Greenstein [D] | Rep. Daniel Benson [D] | Rep. Wayne DeAngelo [D] |
Sen. Gordon Johnson [D] | Sen. Robert Gordon [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-12-07 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-03 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute For A3917 Aca (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-03 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 17 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-16 - Assembly - Assembly State and Local Government Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-22 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-08 - Senate - Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-03 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute For A3917 Aca (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-03 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 17 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-16 - Assembly - Assembly State and Local Government Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-22 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-08 - Senate - Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-11 | Senate | Approved P.L.2015, c.182. |
2015-12-07 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (34-0) |
2015-12-07 | Senate | Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2015-12-03 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (62-0-0) |
2015-12-03 | Assembly | Substituted for A3917 (1R) |
2015-11-16 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2015-11-09 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee |
2015-10-22 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (39-0) |
2015-06-08 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2014-10-23 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3917 (Same As) 2015-12-03 - Substituted by S2523 (1R)