NJ S2567 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A2938
Note: Carry Over of previous S3007
Note: Carry Over of previous S3007
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-08 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
Pending: Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-08 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
Pending: Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides gross income tax exclusion for minimum required distributions from qualified retirement plans.
Title
Provides gross income tax exclusion for minimum required distributions from qualified retirement plans.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-08 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3207 (Same As) 2024-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Aging and Human Services Committee
A2938 (Carry Over) 2022-02-28 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Aging and Senior Services Committee
S3007 (Carry Over) 2022-09-22 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
A2938 (Carry Over) 2022-02-28 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Aging and Senior Services Committee
S3007 (Carry Over) 2022-09-22 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2024/S2567 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2024/S3000/2567_I1.HTM |