NJ S2590 | 2010-2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on December 30 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-23 - Substituted by A1467 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 30 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-23 - Substituted by A1467 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies type of liability insurance coverage certain licensed auto body repair facilities must carry.
Title
Clarifies type of liability insurance coverage certain licensed auto body repair facilities must carry.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-23 | Substituted by A1467 (1R) | |
2011-05-12 | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading | |
2010-12-30 | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A1467 (Same As) 2011-09-16 - Approved P.L.2011, c.127.
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2010/S2590 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2010/S3000/2590_I1.HTM |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2010/S3000/2590_R1.HTM |