NJ S2720 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-10 - Approved P.L.2019, c.110.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-10 - Approved P.L.2019, c.110.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Requires autocycles to be insured by PIP coverage to pedestrians.
Title
Requires autocycles to be insured by PIP coverage to pedestrians.
Sponsors
Sen. Patrick Diegnan [D] | Sen. Nicholas Scutari [D] | Sen. Gordon Johnson [D] | Rep. Annette Quijano [D] |
Rep. Carol Murphy [D] | Rep. BettyLou DeCroce [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A4103 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-10 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2019, c.110. |
2019-03-25 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (77-0-0) |
2019-03-25 | Assembly | Substituted for A4103 (1R) |
2019-03-18 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (35-0) |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-06-14 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4103 (Same As) 2019-03-25 - Substituted by S2720 (1R)