NJ S2726 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A4278
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on November 3 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-13 - Substituted by A2805
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 3 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-13 - Substituted by A2805
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires DMVA to develop online historic tour identifying locations of war battles and places of significance to war efforts in State.
Title
Requires DMVA to develop online historic tour identifying locations of war battles and places of significance to war efforts in State.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-13 | Senate | Substituted by A2805 |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-11-03 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2805 (Same As) 2017-05-11 - Approved P.L.2017, c.78.
A4278 (Carry Over) 2015-05-18 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
A4278 (Carry Over) 2015-05-18 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee