NJ S2839 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Enrolled on January 8 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-08 - Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (65-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on January 8 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-08 - Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (65-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifying ownership requirements for certain homes and seasonal rentals exempt from bulk sale notification requirements.
Title
Clarifying ownership requirements for certain homes and seasonal rentals exempt from bulk sale notification requirements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-01-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute For A4562 Aca (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-18 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-07 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-20 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-18 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-07 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-20 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-08 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (65-0-0) |
2018-01-08 | Assembly | Substituted for A4562 (1R) |
2017-12-18 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2017-12-07 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2017-12-07 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (36-0) |
2017-11-30 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2017-06-19 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2017-06-19 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2016-12-12 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4562 (Same As) 2018-01-08 - Substituted by S2839 (1R)