NJ S2921 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on January 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-01-18 - Approved P.L.2021, c.395.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on January 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-01-18 - Approved P.L.2021, c.395.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows municipalities to designate outdoor areas upon which people may consume alcoholic beverages.
Title
Allows municipalities to designate outdoor areas upon which people may consume alcoholic beverages.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-01-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: Concur in Assembly Amendments (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A5554 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-06 - Assembly - Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - Senate - Senate Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A5554 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-06 - Assembly - Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - Senate - Senate Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-18 | Senate | Approved P.L.2021, c.395. |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (39-0) |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2022-01-10 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (79-0-0) |
2022-01-10 | Assembly | Substituted for A5554 |
2021-12-06 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2021-11-08 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee |
2021-06-30 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (38-0) |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-09-17 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A5554 (Same As) 2022-01-10 - Substituted by S2921 (1R)