NJ S2965 | 2012-2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Vetoed on January 13 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-01-13 - Absolute Veto, Received in the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on January 13 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-01-13 - Absolute Veto, Received in the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes "College Affordability Study Commission" to examine issues and develop recommendations to increase the affordability of higher education in New Jersey.*
Title
Establishes "College Affordability Study Commission" to examine issues and develop recommendations to increase the affordability of higher education in New Jersey.*
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-12-19 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-12-19 - Assembly - Assembly Substitute For A4444 Acs (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-11-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-12-19 - Assembly - Assembly Substitute For A4444 Acs (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-11-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-13 | Senate | Absolute Veto, Received in the Senate |
2013-12-19 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (80-0-0) |
2013-12-19 | Assembly | Substituted for A4444 (ACS) |
2013-11-18 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2013-11-18 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (38-0) |
2013-11-14 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee as a Substitute, 2nd Reading |
2013-09-12 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4444 (Same As) 2013-12-19 - Substituted by S2965 (SCS)