NJ S2973 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on June 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-07 - Substituted by A4763 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-07 - Substituted by A4763 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Revises electronic waste recycling laws.
Title
Revises electronic waste recycling laws.
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Smith [D] | Sen. Christopher Bateman [R] | Sen. Linda Greenstein [D] | Sen. Richard Codey [D] |
Sen. Dawn Addiego [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-12-07 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-22 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-22 - Senate - Senate Floor: Senate Substitute (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-15 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-22 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-22 - Senate - Senate Floor: Senate Substitute (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-15 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-07 | Senate | Substituted by A4763 (1R) |
2015-12-07 | Senate | Senate Amendment (28-0) (Smith) |
2015-10-22 | Senate | Senate Substitution (29-0) (Smith) |
2015-06-15 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee as a Substitute, 2nd Reading |
2015-06-08 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4763 (Same As) 2016-01-19 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session