NJ S2978 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on January 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-01-11 - Approved P.L.2015, c.188.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on January 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-01-11 - Approved P.L.2015, c.188.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes mobile electronic waste destruction units to operate without DEP permit.
Title
Authorizes mobile electronic waste destruction units to operate without DEP permit.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Van Drew [D] | Sen. Steven Oroho [R] | Sen. John Burzichelli [D] | Rep. Grace Spencer [D] |
Rep. Scott Rumana [R] | Rep. Jay Webber [R] | Rep. Daniel Benson [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-12-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute For A4194 Aca (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-16 - Assembly - Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-15 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-16 - Assembly - Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-15 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-11 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2015, c.188. |
2015-12-17 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (67-0-0) |
2015-12-17 | Assembly | Substituted for A4194 (1R) |
2015-11-16 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2015-11-09 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee |
2015-06-29 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (40-0) |
2015-06-15 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2015-06-08 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4194 (Same As) 2015-12-17 - Substituted by S2978 (1R)