NJ S2986 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Passed on June 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-11 - Approved P.L.2019, c.123.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Requires hotels to provide panic devices to certain hotel employees for protection from unsafe working conditions while performing housekeeping duties.*

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires hotels to provide panic devices to certain hotel employees for protection from unsafe working conditions while performing housekeeping duties.*

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A4439 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-03 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-11SenateApproved P.L.2019, c.123.
2019-05-30SenatePassed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (37-0)
2019-05-24SenateReceived in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
2019-05-23AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (76-0-0)
2019-05-23AssemblySubstituted for A4439 (2R)
2019-05-23AssemblyAssembly Floor Amendment Passed (Armato)
2019-02-07AssemblyReceived in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading
2019-01-31SenatePassed by the Senate (37-0)
2018-12-03SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2018-09-24SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee

Same As/Similar To

A4439 (Same As) 2019-05-23 - Substituted by S2986 (2R)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback