NJ S3003 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-26 - Approved P.L.2021, c.39.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-26 - Approved P.L.2021, c.39.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Concerns contributions to the unemployment compensation fund by employee leasing companies.
Title
Concerns contributions to the unemployment compensation fund by employee leasing companies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-01 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A5014 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-14 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-11-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-11-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-11-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: Enact Emergency Clause (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-11-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-08 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A5014 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-14 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-11-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-11-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-11-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: Enact Emergency Clause (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-11-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-08 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-26 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2021, c.39. |
2021-03-01 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (70-0-0) |
2021-03-01 | Assembly | Substituted for A5014 (1R) |
2020-12-14 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-11-16 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee |
2020-11-16 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (37-0) |
2020-11-16 | Senate | Emergency Resolution (38-0) (Madden) |
2020-11-16 | Senate | Senate Amendment (30-0) (Madden) |
2020-10-08 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-10-08 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A5014 (Same As) 2021-03-01 - Substituted by S3003 (1R)