NJ S3015 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on November 16 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-14 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on November 16 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-14 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides temporary corporation business tax and gross income tax credits for job creation related to manufacturing of personal protective equipment.
Title
Provides temporary corporation business tax and gross income tax credits for job creation related to manufacturing of personal protective equipment.
Sponsors
Sen. Stephen Sweeney [D] | Sen. Linda Greenstein [D] | Sen. Troy Singleton [D] | Sen. Dawn Addiego [D] |
Sen. Nellie Pou [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-12-15 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-11-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-11-09 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-11-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-11-09 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-14 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-11-16 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2020-11-16 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (39-0) |
2020-11-09 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-10-19 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4840 (Same As) 2020-12-14 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading