NJ S3064 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Passed on January 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-13 - Approved P.L.2019, c.313.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Passed on January 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-13 - Approved P.L.2019, c.313.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes task force to develop State-wide plan to diversify apprenticeships.
Title
Establishes task force to develop State-wide plan to diversify apprenticeships.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-12-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A4656 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2019, c.313. |
2019-12-16 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (74-2-0) |
2019-12-16 | Assembly | Substituted for A4656 (1R) |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2019-02-25 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (33-1) |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-10-15 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4656 (Same As) 2019-12-16 - Substituted by S3064 (1R)