NJ S3076 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on January 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-01-11 - Approved P.L.2015, c.190.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on January 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-01-11 - Approved P.L.2015, c.190.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Increases maximum legal fee to represent victims from $1,000 to $3,000.
Title
Increases maximum legal fee to represent victims from $1,000 to $3,000.
Sponsors
Sen. Loretta Weinberg [D] | Sen. Christopher Bateman [R] | Sen. Gordon Johnson [D] | Rep. Marlene Caride [D] |
Sen. Linda Greenstein [D] | Sen. Teresa Ruiz [D] | Sen. Patrick Diegnan [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-12-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute For A4621 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 56 N: 9 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-09 - Assembly - Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-22 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 27 N: 9 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-19 - Senate - Senate Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 56 N: 9 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-09 - Assembly - Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-22 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 27 N: 9 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-19 - Senate - Senate Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-11 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2015, c.190. |
2015-12-17 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (56-9-2) |
2015-12-17 | Assembly | Substituted for A4621 |
2015-11-09 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2015-11-09 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee |
2015-10-22 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (27-9) |
2015-10-19 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2015-06-29 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4621 (Same As) 2015-12-17 - Substituted by S3076