NJ S3090 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on October 29 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-21 - Substituted by A4909 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on October 29 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-21 - Substituted by A4909 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes fixed odds wagering on horse races through fixed odds wagering system.
Title
Authorizes fixed odds wagering on horse races through fixed odds wagering system.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-11-09 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-21 | Senate | Substituted by A4909 (1R) |
2020-11-09 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-11-09 | Senate | Transferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2020-10-29 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4909 (Same As) 2021-08-05 - Approved P.L.2021, c.193.