NJ A4909 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-05 - Approved P.L.2021, c.193.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-05 - Approved P.L.2021, c.193.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes fixed odds wagering on horse races through fixed odds wagering system.
Title
Authorizes fixed odds wagering on horse races through fixed odds wagering system.
Sponsors
Rep. Ronald Dancer [R] | Rep. Ralph Caputo [D] | Sen. Paul Sarlo [D] | Sen. Steven Oroho [R] |
Sen. Declan O'Scanlon [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S3090 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Enact Emergency Clause (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - Assembly - Assembly Tourism, Gaming and the Arts Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S3090 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Enact Emergency Clause (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - Assembly - Assembly Tourism, Gaming and the Arts Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-05 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2021, c.193. |
2021-06-21 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (71-0-0) |
2021-06-21 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2021-06-21 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (40-0) |
2021-06-21 | Senate | Emergency Resolution (40-0) (Gopal) |
2021-06-21 | Senate | Senate Amendment (38-0) (Gopal) |
2021-06-21 | Senate | Substituted for S3090 (1R) |
2021-06-01 | Senate | Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (74-0-1) |
2021-05-18 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2021-05-18 | Assembly | Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2020-11-05 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Tourism, Gaming and the Arts Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3090 (Same As) 2021-06-21 - Substituted by A4909 (1R)