NJ S3416 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-29 - Approved P.L.2019, c.70.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-29 - Approved P.L.2019, c.70.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies that "New Jersey Residential Mortgage Lending Act" applies to certain out-of-state persons and involved in residential mortgage lending in the State.*
Title
Clarifies that "New Jersey Residential Mortgage Lending Act" applies to certain out-of-state persons and involved in residential mortgage lending in the State.*
Sponsors
Sen. Steven Oroho [R] | Sen. Troy Singleton [D] | Sen. Dawn Addiego [D] | Rep. Benjie Wimberly [D] |
Rep. Patricia Jones [D] | Sen. John McKeon [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A4998 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A4998 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-29 | Senate | Approved P.L.2019, c.70. |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (37-0) |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2019-03-25 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (79-0-0) |
2019-03-25 | Assembly | Substituted for A4998 (1R) |
2019-03-25 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Wimberly) |
2019-03-25 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (39-0) |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4998 (Same As) 2019-03-25 - Substituted by S3416 (2R)