NJ A4998 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Legislation replaced by S3416
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-25 - Substituted by S3416 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-25 - Substituted by S3416 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies that "New Jersey Residential Mortgage Lending Act" applies to certain out-of-state persons involved in residential mortgage lending in State.
Title
Clarifies that "New Jersey Residential Mortgage Lending Act" applies to certain out-of-state persons involved in residential mortgage lending in State.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-06 - Assembly - Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Assembly - Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Assembly - Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-25 | Assembly | Substituted by S3416 (2R) |
2019-03-07 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2019-03-07 | Assembly | Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee |
2019-02-14 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee |
2019-02-07 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3416 (Same As) 2019-04-29 - Approved P.L.2019, c.70.
S3416 (Replaced by) 2019-04-29 - Approved P.L.2019, c.70.
S3416 (Replaced by) 2019-04-29 - Approved P.L.2019, c.70.